Amended IN Senate May 01, 2023 Amended IN Senate April 12, 2023 Amended IN Senate March 20, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 728Introduced by Senator LimnFebruary 17, 2023 An act to add Chapter 5.1 (commencing with Section 42249) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 728, as amended, Limn. Plastic gift cards: prohibition.Existing law regulates the sale of gift certificates. The definition of a gift certificate includes gift cards, but also specifically exempts gift cards that are usable with multiple sellers of goods or services provided that the expiration date, if any, is printed on the card.Existing law regulates the manufacture, sale, and disposal of various plastic products, including, but not limited to, single-use foodware accessories, single-use carryout bags, trash bags, packaging containers, and microbeads.This bill would prohibit prohibit, beginning January 1, 2026, the sale or distribution of plastic gift cards beginning January 1, 2026. cards, except those that are both usable with multiple unaffiliated sellers of goods and that have the expiration date, if any, printed on the card.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Chapter 5.1 (commencing with Section 42249) is added to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, to read: CHAPTER 5.1. Prohibition on Plastic Gift Cards42249. (a) On and after January 1, 2026, a gift card made of plastic shall not be sold, offered for sale, or distributed in this state.(b) For purposes of this chapter, gift card has the same definition as gift certificate as defined in Section 1749.45 of the Civil Code. Amended IN Senate May 01, 2023 Amended IN Senate April 12, 2023 Amended IN Senate March 20, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 728Introduced by Senator LimnFebruary 17, 2023 An act to add Chapter 5.1 (commencing with Section 42249) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 728, as amended, Limn. Plastic gift cards: prohibition.Existing law regulates the sale of gift certificates. The definition of a gift certificate includes gift cards, but also specifically exempts gift cards that are usable with multiple sellers of goods or services provided that the expiration date, if any, is printed on the card.Existing law regulates the manufacture, sale, and disposal of various plastic products, including, but not limited to, single-use foodware accessories, single-use carryout bags, trash bags, packaging containers, and microbeads.This bill would prohibit prohibit, beginning January 1, 2026, the sale or distribution of plastic gift cards beginning January 1, 2026. cards, except those that are both usable with multiple unaffiliated sellers of goods and that have the expiration date, if any, printed on the card.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Amended IN Senate May 01, 2023 Amended IN Senate April 12, 2023 Amended IN Senate March 20, 2023 Amended IN Senate May 01, 2023 Amended IN Senate April 12, 2023 Amended IN Senate March 20, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 728 Introduced by Senator LimnFebruary 17, 2023 Introduced by Senator Limn February 17, 2023 An act to add Chapter 5.1 (commencing with Section 42249) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 728, as amended, Limn. Plastic gift cards: prohibition. Existing law regulates the sale of gift certificates. The definition of a gift certificate includes gift cards, but also specifically exempts gift cards that are usable with multiple sellers of goods or services provided that the expiration date, if any, is printed on the card.Existing law regulates the manufacture, sale, and disposal of various plastic products, including, but not limited to, single-use foodware accessories, single-use carryout bags, trash bags, packaging containers, and microbeads.This bill would prohibit prohibit, beginning January 1, 2026, the sale or distribution of plastic gift cards beginning January 1, 2026. cards, except those that are both usable with multiple unaffiliated sellers of goods and that have the expiration date, if any, printed on the card. Existing law regulates the sale of gift certificates. The definition of a gift certificate includes gift cards, but also specifically exempts gift cards that are usable with multiple sellers of goods or services provided that the expiration date, if any, is printed on the card. Existing law regulates the manufacture, sale, and disposal of various plastic products, including, but not limited to, single-use foodware accessories, single-use carryout bags, trash bags, packaging containers, and microbeads. This bill would prohibit prohibit, beginning January 1, 2026, the sale or distribution of plastic gift cards beginning January 1, 2026. cards, except those that are both usable with multiple unaffiliated sellers of goods and that have the expiration date, if any, printed on the card. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Chapter 5.1 (commencing with Section 42249) is added to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, to read: CHAPTER 5.1. Prohibition on Plastic Gift Cards42249. (a) On and after January 1, 2026, a gift card made of plastic shall not be sold, offered for sale, or distributed in this state.(b) For purposes of this chapter, gift card has the same definition as gift certificate as defined in Section 1749.45 of the Civil Code. The people of the State of California do enact as follows: ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows: SECTION 1. Chapter 5.1 (commencing with Section 42249) is added to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, to read: CHAPTER 5.1. Prohibition on Plastic Gift Cards42249. (a) On and after January 1, 2026, a gift card made of plastic shall not be sold, offered for sale, or distributed in this state.(b) For purposes of this chapter, gift card has the same definition as gift certificate as defined in Section 1749.45 of the Civil Code. SECTION 1. Chapter 5.1 (commencing with Section 42249) is added to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, to read: ### SECTION 1. CHAPTER 5.1. Prohibition on Plastic Gift Cards42249. (a) On and after January 1, 2026, a gift card made of plastic shall not be sold, offered for sale, or distributed in this state.(b) For purposes of this chapter, gift card has the same definition as gift certificate as defined in Section 1749.45 of the Civil Code. CHAPTER 5.1. Prohibition on Plastic Gift Cards42249. (a) On and after January 1, 2026, a gift card made of plastic shall not be sold, offered for sale, or distributed in this state.(b) For purposes of this chapter, gift card has the same definition as gift certificate as defined in Section 1749.45 of the Civil Code. CHAPTER 5.1. Prohibition on Plastic Gift Cards CHAPTER 5.1. Prohibition on Plastic Gift Cards 42249. (a) On and after January 1, 2026, a gift card made of plastic shall not be sold, offered for sale, or distributed in this state.(b) For purposes of this chapter, gift card has the same definition as gift certificate as defined in Section 1749.45 of the Civil Code. 42249. (a) On and after January 1, 2026, a gift card made of plastic shall not be sold, offered for sale, or distributed in this state. (b) For purposes of this chapter, gift card has the same definition as gift certificate as defined in Section 1749.45 of the Civil Code.