Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 3055.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3012.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 2959.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Set for hearing January 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
April 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 803.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|