Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1182.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 834.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|