|
06/23/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1679.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Urgency clause adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2288.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 962.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 875.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 684.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|