Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | April 19 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.I. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |