|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 410, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2478.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2866.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1213.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 871.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|