California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB748 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill June 30, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023