Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 2818.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 17. Page 3486.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1342.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 994.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
April 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
April 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|