Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1305.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 871.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|