|
09/01/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2743.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1215.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 800.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 658.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|