Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Ortega.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1054.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 902.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|