|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 634, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2592.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2743.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1004.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 768.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|