Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | January 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Set for hearing January 18. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Set for hearing January 16. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | May 15 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 941.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 747.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Set for hearing April 26 in HEALTH pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |