Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
June 18 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on A., E., S., & T. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1351.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1183.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 895.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 747.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|