Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1054.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 873.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |