Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1351.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1184.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 896.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 13. Noes 4. Page 769.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|