Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
July 11 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1305.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 902.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|