|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 720, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2955.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 960.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 792.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 574.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|