Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 12/18/2023 | January 10 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 12/07/2023 | Set for hearing January 10. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | April 26 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and INS. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 12/06/2022 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |