Senate
|
09/20/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 7. Page 6444.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 3047.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 2959.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Set for hearing January 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
April 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 803.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|