|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 635, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2682.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3207.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1305.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 877.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 832.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|