Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |