Assembly | 07/11/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1246.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 535.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Set for hearing March 27. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |