Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
April 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on A., E., S., & T. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1385.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1185.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 896.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 747.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
April 24 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|