Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | January 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 12/07/2023 | Set for hearing January 9. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | April 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 2. Page 660.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |