|
07/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2427.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1055.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 900.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|