|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 509, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2866.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2023
|
June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1079.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 872.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|