Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | January 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | Set for hearing January 10. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |