Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 658.) (April 11). | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | March 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Set for hearing March 28. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |