Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 2798.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3391.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 8. Page 1384.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 904.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|