Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | January 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Set for hearing January 18. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Set for hearing January 16. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2959.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Set for hearing January 9. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |