Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | April 12 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |