Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1306.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1186.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 571.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|