06/29/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2023. | |||
06/29/2023 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/21/2023 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2023 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2264.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 7). | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 699.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 574.) (March 29). | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |