|
09/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 188, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2182.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2743.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1055.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 936.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
April 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|