|
10/04/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 312, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2834.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3146.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2023
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bryan.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2023
|
June 12 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1056.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 939.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|