|
09/22/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2478.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2866.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1003.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 905.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|