Senate | 04/16/2024 | April 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | April 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |