California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB902 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2024

Amended

Bill August 19, 2024
Bill April 3, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024