LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB922
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB922
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB922
Action History
Senate
04/02/2024
April 2 hearing postponed by committee.
Senate
03/06/2024
Set for hearing April 2.
Senate
02/14/2024
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
Senate
01/12/2024
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
Senate
01/11/2024
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.