California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB946 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 14, 2024