California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB949 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 18, 2024

Amended

Bill June 5, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024