California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB958 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill August 19, 2024
Bill June 10, 2024