Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Zbur.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4105.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3965.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3468.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|