California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB961 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 21, 2024
Bill June 19, 2024
Bill May 8, 2024
Bill April 30, 2024
Bill April 16, 2024