|
09/24/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 546, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6697.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4208.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3965.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3283.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Set for hearing March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|