Senate | 05/16/2024 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (March 20). | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Set for hearing March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |