Senate | 05/16/2024 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3730.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3530.) (April 9). | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB S. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |