Senate
|
09/28/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 5506.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6549.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 4075.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3966.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|