|
09/20/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 321, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 5799.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 4. Page 7108.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 4027.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3966.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3724.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|